This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 00:20:58 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. PINEDA, MARTIN

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PINEDA, MARTIN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2990

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

PINEDA, MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: time estimate 45 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Time Estimate 45 Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Time Estimate 45 Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC311.11(a)-F- Possession/Control Of Child Pornography; Not Guilty; 002; PC136.1(b)(1)-F- Dissuading Witness From Reporting Crime; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketInterpreter Required During Hearing; Comment: Spanish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney M Emmons; CPD 22-03593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: PINEDA, MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PINEDA, MARTIN; 001; Description: PC311.11(a)-F- Possession/Control Of Child Pornography; Statute: 311.11(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PINEDA, MARTIN; 002; Description: PC136.1(b)(1)-F- Dissuading Witness From Reporting Crime; Statute: 136.1(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.