Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 20:02:31 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Penick, Arielle Noelle Ruth

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Penick, Arielle Noelle Ruth. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2992

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Penick, Arielle Noelle Ruth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketProposed Criminal Protective Order - PC136.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Emmons, BCSO 21-03430

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • ChargePenick, Arielle Noelle Ruth; PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Statute: 368(c); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel