This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 23:11:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Pate, Mitchell Austin

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Pate, Mitchell Austin. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3587

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pate, Mitchell Austin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 07/29/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 120 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Reinstated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment Violation - Post Release Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 07/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPetition - Revoke Post Release Community Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Pate, Mitchell Austin; 001; Description: PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latimer, Denver Michael