This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 03:12:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. PALOMARES, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PALOMARES, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

PALOMARES, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 12 day estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC187(a)-F- Murder; Not Guilty; 001; PC12022.53(d)- Discharge Of Firearm With Injury: Additional 25 Years To Life; Deny; 001; PC12022.5(a)- Use Of Firearm In Commission Of Felony: Additional Term; Deny; 002; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 003; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 002; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 003; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny; 001; PC667(a)(1) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction: Additional 5 Years Each Prior; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: complaint deemed information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Complaint Deemed Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOrder on Media Request to Permit Coverage; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCourt Reporter's Transcript; Comment: Preliminary Hearing 5/20/2022 (J. Alexander)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMedia Request to Photograph, Record, or Broadcast

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC1170.12(b)- Prior Conviction as a Prior Felony; Statute: 1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.5(a)- Use Of Firearm In Commission Of Felony: Additional Term; Statute: 12022.5(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.53(b)- Use Of Firearm: Additional 10 Years; Statute: 12022.53(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.5(a)- Use Of Firearm In Commission Of Felony: Additional Term; Statute: 12022.5(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.53(c)- Discharge Of Firearm: Additional 20 Years; Statute: 12022.53(c); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.53(d)- Discharge Of Firearm With Injury: Additional 25 Years To Life; Statute: 12022.53(d); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC12022.53(d)- Discharge Of Firearm With Injury: Additional 25 Years To Life; Statute: 12022.53(d); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC187(a)-F- Murder; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: PALOMARES, FERNANDO; 001; Description: PC187(a)-F- Murder; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew