This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 21:01:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4616

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued To BCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: Complaint Deemed Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Held to Answer; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Held to Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Arraignment on Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint Deemed Information pursuant to Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Preliminary Hearing and Held to Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M Emmons; BCSO 22-06149

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN; 001; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PALMER, BRADLEY JOHN; 001; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew