This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 22:01:48 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Paiva, Daniel William

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Paiva, Daniel William. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Lucena, Kristen A, Deems, Michael R and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0014

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

Deems, Michael R

Giordano, Raymond J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Paiva, Daniel William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Hunter; FG FW-2201-0043

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Paiva, Daniel William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Paiva, Daniel William; 001; Description: PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana