This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 22:02:04 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Page, Jermine Lavon

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Page, Jermine Lavon. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3159

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Page, Jermine Lavon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketFingerprint Form; Comment: submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 45 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Time estimate 45 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC597(a)-F- Cruelty To Animal; Not Guilty; 002; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Not Guilty; 003; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney D Noel CPD 21-03590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Page, Jermine Lavon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • ChargePage, Jermine Lavon; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • ChargePage, Jermine Lavon; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • ChargePage, Jermine Lavon; PC597(a)-F- Cruelty To Animal; Statute: 597(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew