This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Olszewski, Ashley Rose

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Olszewski, Ashley Rose. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Gingery, Virginia and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3604

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Gingery, Virginia

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Olszewski, Ashley Rose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Court Probation; 002; HS11550(a)-M- Under The Influence Drug/Narcotic; Court Probation; 501862 390918 100018 4370826 501862 dbxCAFINERESTFineDueDate 4370827 501862 dbxCAFINERESTRestitutionDueDate 4370828 501862 mskCAFINERESTFineAmount 290.00 4370829 501862 mskCAFINERESTFineSuspendedAmount 4370830 501862 mskCAFINERESTRestitutionAmount 4370831 501862 mskCAFINERESTTotalAmountDue 290.00 4370832 501862 txtCAFINERESTComment $150 PC 1202.4(b); $80 PC 1465.8; $60 GC 70373 CAFINEREST; Probation; Type: Court Probation; Start Date: 07/21/2021; Term: 1 Year; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Active; 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Sentenced-Plea of guilty/nolo; 002; HS11550(a)-M- Under The Influence Drug/Narcotic; Sentenced-Plea of guilty/nolo; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; No Contest; 002; HS11550(a)-M- Under The Influence Drug/Narcotic; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; 002; HS11550(a)-M- Under The Influence Drug/Narcotic; Not Guilty; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProbation Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo, PPD 21-0748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeOlszewski, Ashley Rose; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeOlszewski, Ashley Rose; HS11550(a)-M- Under The Influence Drug/Narcotic; Statute: 11550(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeOlszewski, Ashley Rose; PC30305(a)(1)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel