This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 10:41:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Nunez, Caesar, Jr.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nunez, Caesar, Jr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0154

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Nunez, Caesar, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time est: 30 min

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: time est 30 min

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Pretrial Supervision Release Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOR Workup with Pretrial Recommendation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Marc Noel; BCSO 23-00275

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Nunez, Caesar, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Nunez, Caesar, Jr.; 001; Description: PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Statute: 21310; Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less