This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 23:35:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Noel, Elise Simon

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Noel, Elise Simon. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2337

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Noel, Elise Simon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketMisdemeanor Diversion Review - PC1001.95; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketWork Program Orientation; Comment: 20hrs due- Due date per order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: PC977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; BP25661(a)-M- Possession Or Presentation Of False Identification By Person Under Age Of 21; Not Guilty; 002; BP25662(a)-M- Minor Under 21 In Possession Of Alcohol In Public Place; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Defendant's Motion for Misdemeanor Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Need Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: Motion for Misdemeanor Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney D. Jones ABC 22-51-018 with Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Noel, Elise Simon; 002; Description: BP25662(a)-M- Minor Under 21 In Possession Of Alcohol In Public Place; Statute: 25662(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Noel, Elise Simon; 001; Description: BP25661(a)-M- Possession Or Presentation Of False Identification By Person Under Age Of 21; Statute: 25661(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hearne, Susan M