This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 22:04:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Deems, Michael R and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0357

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

Giordano, Raymond J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Bail Hotline Bail Bonds FCS50-2402079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 006; Description: PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Statute: 484(a)-488-490.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 005; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 004; Description: HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 003; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 002; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 002; Description: PC1203.07(a)(11) - Prior Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Statute: 1203.07(a)(11); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 002; Description: HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 001; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 001; Description: PC1203.07(a)(11) - Prior Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Statute: 1203.07(a)(11); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Murray, Michael Kempton, Jr.; 001; Description: HS11351-F- Possession For Sale Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11351; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.