This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 23:23:25 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Moran, Juan Antonio

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Moran, Juan Antonio. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3856

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moran, Juan Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 30 minute time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 30 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC459-F- Burglary; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Bennett GPD 22-554

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Moran, Juan Antonio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moran, Juan Antonio; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Moran, Juan Antonio; 001; Description: PC459-F- Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.