This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 00:39:01 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Moore, Patrick John

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Moore, Patrick John. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5706

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moore, Patrick John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moore, Patrick John; 004; Description: VC40508(a)-M- Failure To Appear On Written Promise/Granted Continuance; Statute: 40508(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: VC40508(a) Failure to Appear added 11/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Rust CHPO M491-240-21 With Copy of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moore, Patrick John; 003; Description: VC21460(a)-I- Unlawful Lane Change At Double Solid Yellow Lines; Statute: 21460(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moore, Patrick John; 002; Description: VC16028(a)-I- Failure To Provide Financial Responsibility Evidence To Officer; Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moore, Patrick John; 001; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant