This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 22:06:31 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Moore, Michael Lawrence

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Moore, Michael Lawrence. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1102

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Moore, Michael Lawrence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo; CPD 21-06967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Moore, Michael Lawrence; 001; Description: PC484(a)-488-490.5(a)-M- Petty Theft Involving Merchandise; Statute: 484(a)-488-490.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana