This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 01:17:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3585

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 20 min time est; bench warrant held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 20 min est

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney D.M. Noel PPD 22-0599

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO; 002; Description: PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: MOJICA, JAVIER ZAMUDIO; 001; Description: PC25850(a)-F- Carrying Loaded Handgun On Person In Public; Statute: 25850(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant