This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 22:30:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. MELTON, ANTHONY LEE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MELTON, ANTHONY LEE. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3582

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

MELTON, ANTHONY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 45 minute estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC273a(a)-F- Child Abuse Likely To Produce Great Bodily Harm/Death; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Pretrial Supervision Release Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney D.M. Noel CPD 22-04510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: MELTON, ANTHONY LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: MELTON, ANTHONY LEE; 001; Description: PC273a(a)-F- Child Abuse Likely To Produce Great Bodily Harm/Death; Statute: 273a(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew