This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 23:23:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Medrano, Juan Miguel

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Medrano, Juan Miguel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3855

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Medrano, Juan Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 30 min time est

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketLetter of Acceptance - Treatment or Rehabilitation Facility; Comment: Daxit - Letter of Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC459-F- Burglary; Not Guilty; 002; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 003; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; 004; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Bennett GBPD 22-554

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Medrano, Juan Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Medrano, Juan Miguel; 004; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Medrano, Juan Miguel; 003; Description: PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Medrano, Juan Miguel; 002; Description: PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Medrano, Juan Miguel; 001; Description: PC459-F- Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore