This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 23:08:26 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. McCarter, Jabree Arrion

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against McCarter, Jabree Arrion. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2912

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

McCarter, Jabree Arrion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 45 min time est

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Time Estimate: 45 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: K. Sears

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Order for Bail Subject to PC1275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney M Emmons OPD 22-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketBail Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: People's Request to Set Bail at No Bail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: McCarter, Jabree Arrion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: McCarter, Jabree Arrion; 002; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: McCarter, Jabree Arrion; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: McCarter, Jabree Arrion; 001; Description: PC273.5(f)(1)-F- Corporal Injury Within 7 Years Of Previous Conviction; Statute: 273.5(f)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.