This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/08/2022 at 20:02:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. MARTINEZ, ANGELICA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARTINEZ, ANGELICA. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3850

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

MARTINEZ, ANGELICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: MARTINEZ, ANGELICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards PK 220529N-0108

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: MARTINEZ, ANGELICA; 002; Description: HN655(c)-M- Operation Of Vessel/Device With Blood Alcohol .08 Or Higher; Statute: 655(c); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: MARTINEZ, ANGELICA; 001; Description: HN655(b)- Unlawful Operation Of Device While Under Influence Of Drug/Alcohol; Statute: 655(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel