This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:21 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. MARSH, COLE DYLEN

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARSH, COLE DYLEN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3602

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

MARSH, COLE DYLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case (Pretrial Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: MARSH, COLE DYLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Emmons, OPD 21-2632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeMARSH, COLE DYLEN; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew