This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs MARSH, COLE DYLEN

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARSH, COLE DYLEN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Candela, Michael P and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3601

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

MARSH, COLE DYLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Petelin, James J

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Post disposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case (Admit/Deny Violation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Trailing 21CF03642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 7/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 7/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 7/15/21; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeMARSH, COLE DYLEN; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew