This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 20:02:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Mackusick, Kristopher E

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Mackusick, Kristopher E. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5117

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mackusick, Kristopher E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC496(a)-M- Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: If released

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Hunter CPD 21-5970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Mackusick, Kristopher E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • ChargeMackusick, Kristopher E; PC496(a)-M- Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana