This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:46 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Loucel, Raymond Martin

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Loucel, Raymond Martin. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5995

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Loucel, Raymond Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC646.9(a)-F- Stalking; No Contest; 002; PC646.9(a)-F- Stalking; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Comment: Non-DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney M. Emmons; BCSO 21-06435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Loucel, Raymond Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeLoucel, Raymond Martin; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeLoucel, Raymond Martin; PC646.9(a)-F- Stalking; Statute: 646.9(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeLoucel, Raymond Martin; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeLoucel, Raymond Martin; PC646.9(a)-F- Stalking; Statute: 646.9(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana