This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 20:10:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Long, Robert Ernest

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Long, Robert Ernest. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Deems, Michael R, Merrifield, Kimberly and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2982

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

Merrifield, Kimberly

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Long, Robert Ernest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing mental health case (pretrial conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC314(1)-M- Indecent Exposure; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 08/05/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo BCSO 22-03881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 08/05/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Long, Robert Ernest; 001; Description: PC314(1)-M- Indecent Exposure; Statute: 314(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.