This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 20:10:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Long, Robert Ernest

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Long, Robert Ernest. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2974

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Long, Robert Ernest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing mental health case (preliminary hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 30 Minute Time Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC452(c)-F- Recklessly Causing Forest Fire; Not Guilty; 002; PRC4421-M- Unlawful Burning Lands Of Another; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo; 22CABTU010708

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Long, Robert Ernest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Long, Robert Ernest; 002; Description: PRC4421-M- Unlawful Burning Lands Of Another; Statute: 4421; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Long, Robert Ernest; 001; Description: PC452(c)-F- Recklessly Causing Forest Fire; Statute: 452(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.