This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 21:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Long, David Eugene

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Long, David Eugene. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Chandler, Christopher R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5701

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Chandler, Christopher R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Long, David Eugene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC4532(b)(2)-F- Escape From Jail With Force/Violence; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 002; PC4532(b)(1)-F- Escape from Jail While Arrested, Charged, or Convicted of Felony; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAmended Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo, BCSO 21-04824

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Long, David Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • ChargeLong, David Eugene; PC4532(b)(1)-F- Escape from Jail While Arrested, Charged, or Convicted of Felony; Statute: 4532(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • ChargeLong, David Eugene; PC4532(b)(2)-F- Escape From Jail With Force/Violence; Statute: 4532(b)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • ChargeLong, David Eugene; PC4532(b)(2)-F- Escape From Jail With Force/Violence; Statute: 4532(b)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana