This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/19/2022 at 23:03:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Lockner, Andrew Keith

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lockner, Andrew Keith. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Lucena, Kristen A, Caraway, Corie J, Chandler, Christopher R, Deems, Michael R, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Heithecker, Philip H and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

Caraway, Corie J

Chandler, Christopher R

Deems, Michael R

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Heithecker, Philip H

Giordano, Raymond J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lockner, Andrew Keith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Femino, Stephana

Henson, Saul W

Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing 22CF00497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: J. Raven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Lee; BCSO 21-07455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Lockner, Andrew Keith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lockner, Andrew Keith; 001; Description: PC242-M- Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana