This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/19/2022 at 21:03:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2469

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Statement of Rights; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; Public Defender: Fahey, Michael W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Not Guilty; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Not Guilty; 003; VC2800(a)-M- Failure To Comply With Lawful Order Of Peace Officer; Not Guilty; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - Limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards; CHP 22-1987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; 003; Description: VC2800(a)-M- Failure To Comply With Lawful Order Of Peace Officer; Statute: 2800(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LISLE, BRYAN SCOTT; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W