This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/06/2022 at 22:03:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. LEWIS, GENA LEANN

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEWIS, GENA LEANN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shockley, Doris L, Heithecker, Philip H, Lucena, Kristen A and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1155

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shockley, Doris L

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

LEWIS, GENA LEANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-M- Theft; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; PC1320(a)-M- Failure To Appear; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Setting/Resetting; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Possible Developmental Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketReport; Comment: Report from Far Northern Regional Center pursuant to PC1001.20 (faxed copy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketReport; Comment: Report from Far Northern Regional Center Original Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-M- Theft; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketTime Not Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:35 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Vacate 5/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trailing 21CM05905; Cited for 5/6/22. Vacate 5/6/22 if defendant appears.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen, GBPD 22-140, with copy of citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: LEWIS, GENA LEANN; 001; Description: PC484(a)-M- Theft; Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel