This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:38:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Lavender, Andrew Daruss

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lavender, Andrew Daruss. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5715

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lavender, Andrew Daruss

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 02/07/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 03/06/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 64 Days; Comment: Programs authorized

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 001; VC23582(a)- With Excessive Speed: Additional Penalty; Found True; 002; VC23582(a)- With Excessive Speed: Additional Penalty; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit; 001; VC23582(a)- With Excessive Speed: Additional Penalty; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Unsigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul CHPO M282-240-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 002; Description: VC23582(a)- With Excessive Speed: Additional Penalty; Statute: 23582(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 001; Description: VC23582(a)- With Excessive Speed: Additional Penalty; Statute: 23582(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lavender, Andrew Daruss; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W