This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 20:02:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Larson, Daniel Theodore

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Larson, Daniel Theodore. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4552

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Larson, Daniel Theodore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Carlos, Christopher John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 45 Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketTime Waiver - General; Comment: PX Time Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Time est 45 mins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 001; PC1203.07(a)(11) - Prior Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Deny; 002; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 003; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Furry; BNTF 21-05092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Larson, Daniel Theodore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeLarson, Daniel Theodore; PC30305(a)(1)-F- Unlawful Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeLarson, Daniel Theodore; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeLarson, Daniel Theodore; PC1203.07(a)(11) - Prior Health And Safety Conviction: Probation Ineligible; Statute: 1203.07(a)(11); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • ChargeLarson, Daniel Theodore; HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos, Christopher John