This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 22:04:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Landowski, Ethan William

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Landowski, Ethan William. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Heithecker, Philip H and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1441

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Landowski, Ethan William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 003; VC23103-23103.5-M- Reckless Driving - Alcohol Related; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: PC977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketPeople's Statement- Reason for Substitution of Lesser Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketPC 977 - Waiver of Personal Appearance by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S Edwards CPD 22-00584

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Landowski, Ethan William; 003; Description: VC23103-23103.5-M- Reckless Driving - Alcohol Related; Statute: 23103-23103.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Landowski, Ethan William; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Landowski, Ethan William; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hearne, Susan M