This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 00:43:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Lacey, Theodore Willis, III

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lacey, Theodore Willis, III. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5716

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lacey, Theodore Willis, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Femino, Stephana

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Logs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Proof of Enrollment, Receipt of Signed Probation Order, Logs* (09/13/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Court Probation; 004; VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; Court Probation; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 06/30/2022; Start Time: 3:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 34 Days; Comment: 96 Hours for Ct. 2 and 30 Days for Ct. 4; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 003; VC23152(g)-M- Driving Under The Combined Influence Of Alcohol And Drugs; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 004; VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 005; VC20002(a)-M- Hit And Run Property Damage; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 003; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; No Contest; 004; VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; No Contest; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul, OPD 21-1063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 005; Description: VC20002(a)-M- Hit And Run Property Damage; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 004; Description: VC2800.1(a)-M- Evading An Officer; Statute: 2800.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 003; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 003; Description: VC23152(g)-M- Driving Under The Combined Influence Of Alcohol And Drugs; Statute: 23152(g); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lacey, Theodore Willis, III; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana