This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 22:01:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. KELLY, RYAN JAMES

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KELLY, RYAN JAMES. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Caraway, Corie J, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5415

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

KELLY, RYAN JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProbation Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: Petition Filed 1/3/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPetition - Violation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney E Bennett; BCSO 21-04790DA-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Add-on per DA; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: KELLY, RYAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • ChargeKELLY, RYAN JAMES; PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • ChargeKELLY, RYAN JAMES; PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Statute: 1320(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore