This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 23:54:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Keddy, Seth Sawyer

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Keddy, Seth Sawyer. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Lucena, Kristen A and Chandler, Christopher R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3330

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Lucena, Kristen A

Chandler, Christopher R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Keddy, Seth Sawyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Davis, Grady M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketRuling on Preliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Submitted on Police Reports

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: Motion to Seal Police Reports Submitted for Preliminary Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Submitted on Police Reports

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Preliminary Hearing Commenced; Comment: 59 minutes time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: 59 minutes time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Not Guilty; 002; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Not Guilty; 003; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Not Guilty; 004; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Not Guilty; 005; PC273.5(f)(2)-F- Corporal Injury Within 7 Years Of Previous Conviction Per PC243(e); Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney L Sears CPD 22-04223 and CPD 22-07117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Keddy, Seth Sawyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting; Comment: Duplicate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Keddy, Seth Sawyer; 004; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Keddy, Seth Sawyer; 003; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Keddy, Seth Sawyer; 002; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Keddy, Seth Sawyer; 001; Description: PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony 1st Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Keddy, Seth Sawyer; 005; Description: PC273.5(f)(2)-F- Corporal Injury Within 7 Years Of Previous Conviction Per PC243(e); Statute: 273.5(f)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davis, Grady M