This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 21:15:58 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jones, David Wayne

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jones, David Wayne. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3147

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jones, David Wayne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 59 minute time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Time Estimate: 59 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Not Guilty; 002; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Not Guilty; 003; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Not Guilty; 004; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Not Guilty; 005; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Not Guilty; 006; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Not Guilty; 007; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Not Guilty; 008; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Comment: PX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Jones, David Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 008; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 007; Description: VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 006; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 005; Description: VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 004; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 003; Description: VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 002; Description: PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jones, David Wayne; 001; Description: VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W