This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:10 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Johnson, Shanadoa Wayne

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Johnson, Shanadoa Wayne. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5987

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Johnson, Shanadoa Wayne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC148.9(b)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Terminal Sentence; 002; 14CCR4302-M- Failure to Pay Required Fee For Facility Use; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days; Comment: Release programs authorized.; 509205 394202 100018 4579965 509205 dbxCAFINERESTFineDueDate 4579966 509205 dbxCAFINERESTRestitutionDueDate 4579967 509205 mskCAFINERESTFineAmount 290.00 4579968 509205 mskCAFINERESTFineSuspendedAmount 4579969 509205 mskCAFINERESTRestitutionAmount 4579970 509205 mskCAFINERESTTotalAmountDue 290.00 4579971 509205 txtCAFINERESTComment CAFINEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC148.9(b)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; 14CCR4302-M- Failure to Pay Required Fee For Facility Use; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 003; VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC148.9(b)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; No Contest; 002; 14CCR4302-M- Failure to Pay Required Fee For Facility Use; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen; PK 211120N-0139

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Johnson, Shanadoa Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • ChargeJohnson, Shanadoa Wayne; VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • ChargeJohnson, Shanadoa Wayne; 14CCR4302-M- Failure to Pay Required Fee For Facility Use; Statute: T14 4302; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2021
  • ChargeJohnson, Shanadoa Wayne; PC148.9(b)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel