This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:37:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Johnson, Raymond Lewis

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Johnson, Raymond Lewis. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5710

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Johnson, Raymond Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Solutions For Positive Choices 18M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/28/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 14 Days; Comment: Programs Authorized.; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Found True; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 003; VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 003; VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketJudicial Officer Statement of Disclosure; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Solutions For Positive Choices

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CHPO M235-240-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Raymond Lewis; 003; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Raymond Lewis; 002; Description: VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Raymond Lewis; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Raymond Lewis; 001; Description: VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Raymond Lewis; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W