This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 12:10:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Johnson, Devin Charles

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Johnson, Devin Charles. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3523

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Johnson, Devin Charles

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to Butte County Sheriff's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketArraignment Violation - Post Release Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: Petition filed 7/21/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPetition - Revoke Post Release Community Supervision

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Johnson, Devin Charles; 001; Description: PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455; Level: Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant