This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 20:01:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jimenez, Yazmin Moreno

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jimenez, Yazmin Moreno. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Caraway, Corie J and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5184

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jimenez, Yazmin Moreno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 45 minute estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon; Not Guilty; 002; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Not Guilty; 003; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Not Guilty; 004; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Comment: Preliminary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Address True Last Name

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProposed Criminal Protective Order - PC136.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M Emmons; CPD 21-06039, CPD 21-05666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Jimenez, Yazmin Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • ChargeJimenez, Yazmin Moreno; PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • ChargeJimenez, Yazmin Moreno; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • ChargeJimenez, Yazmin Moreno; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • ChargeJimenez, Yazmin Moreno; PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana