This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 04:19:16 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jenkins, Katylynn Pamela McIntyre

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jenkins, Katylynn Pamela McIntyre. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly, Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J, Deems, Michael R and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6002

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Worley, Kurt W

Merrifield, Kimberly

Deems, Michael R

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jenkins, Katylynn Pamela McIntyre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 2 day time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 2 day time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 2 day time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Terminal Sentence; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 05/13/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days; Comment: Programs authorized

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; No Contest; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 2/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProposed Criminal Protective Order - PC136.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen; CPD 21-7045

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jenkins, Katylynn Pamela McIntyre; 002; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jenkins, Katylynn Pamela McIntyre; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel