This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 23:01:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Candela, Michael P, Merrifield, Kimberly, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Chandler, Christopher R and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1192

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Chandler, Christopher R

Candela, Michael P

Merrifield, Kimberly

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Cardoza, Anthony R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Setting/Resetting; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial Setting/Resetting; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC191.5(a)-F- Gross Vehicular Manslaughter While Intoxicated; Not Guilty; 002; VC23153(a)-F- Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol Causing Injury; Not Guilty; 003; VC23153(b)-F- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol Causing Injury; Not Guilty; 001; VC20001(c)- Offense Involved Fleeing Scene: Additional 5 Years; Deny; 003; PC12022.7(a)- With Great Bodily Injury: Additional 3 Years; Deny; 002; PC12022.7(a)- With Great Bodily Injury: Additional 3 Years; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketFingerprint Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: People to file Information; Fingerprint Card needed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Preliminary Hearing and Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketRequest to Set Bail at No Bail; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketOrder for Bail to be Increased or Conditioned per PC1269; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 003; Description: PC12022.7(a)- With Great Bodily Injury: Additional 3 Years; Statute: 12022.7(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 003; Description: VC23153(b)-F- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol Causing Injury; Statute: 23153(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 002; Description: PC12022.7(a)- With Great Bodily Injury: Additional 3 Years; Statute: 12022.7(a); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 002; Description: VC23153(a)-F- Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol Causing Injury; Statute: 23153(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 001; Description: VC20001(c)- Offense Involved Fleeing Scene: Additional 5 Years; Statute: 20001(c); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobsen, Chase Johnnie; 001; Description: PC191.5(a)-F- Gross Vehicular Manslaughter While Intoxicated; Statute: 191.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardoza, Anthony R