This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:04 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Hummel, Vanya Ericson

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hummel, Vanya Ericson. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3597

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hummel, Vanya Ericson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Marshall, Robert L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: trailing mental health case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Garner, CPD 20-06535DA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • ChargeHummel, Vanya Ericson; PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • ChargeHummel, Vanya Ericson; PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Statute: 1320(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall, Robert L