This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 17:35:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Heithecker, Philip H and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0223

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Court Probation; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/11/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 05/13/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 20 Days; Comment: Programs authorized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Found True; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Admit; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketIgnition Interlock Device

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketWarrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney A. Insul; CHPO M651-240-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS; 001; Description: VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HORTON, DAVID WAYNE ANDROUS; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W