This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 21:04:11 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. HOLLAND, REX ALAN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOLLAND, REX ALAN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4904

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

HOLLAND, REX ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Erpino, Michael Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC368(b)(1)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Likely To Produce Injury Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Not Guilty; 002; PC591.5-M- Interference With Wireless Device To Prevent Aid; Not Guilty; 003; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Erpino, Michael Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen; BCSO 21-04091

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • ChargeHOLLAND, REX ALAN; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • ChargeHOLLAND, REX ALAN; PC591.5-M- Interference With Wireless Device To Prevent Aid; Statute: 591.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • ChargeHOLLAND, REX ALAN; PC368(b)(1)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Likely To Produce Injury Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Statute: 368(b)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erpino, Michael Thomas