This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 20:02:58 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Hogan, Travis Lee

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Hogan, Travis Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2443

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hogan, Travis Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Receipt of Prop 63 Advisement and Forms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney T Vercruyssen BCSO 22-03228 and PPD 22-0085

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Hogan, Travis Lee; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Hogan, Travis Lee; 002; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel