This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 21:03:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. HERRERA, SORIAH A

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HERRERA, SORIAH A. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1957

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

HERRERA, SORIAH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: proof of enrollment, completion of GPS, signed probation order, payment plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketReferral to DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Need Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPC 977 - Waiver of Personal Appearance by Defendant; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Hearne, Susan Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CHPO M026-240-22 with Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HERRERA, SORIAH A; 003; Description: VC16028(a)-I- Failure To Provide Financial Responsibility Evidence To Officer; Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HERRERA, SORIAH A; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HERRERA, SORIAH A; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HERRERA, SORIAH A; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HERRERA, SORIAH A; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hearne, Susan M