Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 20:02:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Henson, Brian Wallace Ray

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Henson, Brian Wallace Ray. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2994

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Henson, Brian Wallace Ray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDisposition Following Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Petition Filed 6/10/21; Parole Revoked 6/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C. Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 6/10/21; Parole revoked 6/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 6/10/21; Parole revoked 6/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketParole Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: petition filed 6/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Petition filed 6/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petiton filed 6/10/2021; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Henson, Brian Wallace Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • ChargeHenson, Brian Wallace Ray; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J