This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 21:02:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. HEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Gingery, Virginia and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5702

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Gingery, Virginia

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

HEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; PC21510(b)-M- Carrying Switchblade Knife Upon Person; Court Probation; 002; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Court Probation; Probation; Type: Court Probation; Start Date: 11/10/2021; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 11/10/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Active; 11/10/2021; 508030 393638 100018 4546925 508030 dbxCAFINERESTFineDueDate 4546926 508030 dbxCAFINERESTRestitutionDueDate 4546927 508030 mskCAFINERESTFineAmount 290.00 4546928 508030 mskCAFINERESTFineSuspendedAmount 4546929 508030 mskCAFINERESTRestitutionAmount 4546930 508030 mskCAFINERESTTotalAmountDue 290.00 4546931 508030 txtCAFINERESTComment CAFINEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC21510(b)-M- Carrying Switchblade Knife Upon Person; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; 001; PC21510(b)-M- Carrying Switchblade Knife Upon Person; No Contest; 002; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen, CPD 21-06646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: HEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • ChargeHEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • ChargeHEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • ChargeHEAVRIN, WILLIAM BARRY; PC21510(b)-M- Carrying Switchblade Knife Upon Person; Statute: 21510(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomes, Tahj Emmanuel