This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 21:04:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Heithecker, Philip H and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1724

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 5 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Not Guilty; 002; PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Not Guilty; 001; PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Deny; 002; PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketLetter(s) Submitted to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketLetter of Acceptance - Treatment or Rehabilitation Facility

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Progress report from rehab facility; Bench Warrant Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketWarrant Recalled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Recall Warrant; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Femino, Stephana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOrder on Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Sears BCSO 21-00967DA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE; 002; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE; 002; Description: PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Statute: 1320(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE; 001; Description: PC12022.1- Felony Committed While Released From Custody; Statute: 12022.1; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: HAUSER, NICOLE ALICE; 001; Description: PC1320(b)-F- Failure To Appear; Statute: 1320(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana